THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:37:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fort Erie Family Group Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Ephrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ephrat (CPSO#: 101652 )
Business Address: Fort Erie Family Group Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
(905) 871-1220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fort Erie Family Group Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Ephrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ephrat (CPSO#: 101652 )
Business Address: Fort Erie Family Group Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
(905) 871-1220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PINHAS EPHRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPHRAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PINHAS EPHRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EPHRAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013