THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 562 6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Genevieve Casey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Casey (CPSO#: 101662 )
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
613 774 2420
Business Address: 43 Bruyère Street
43 Bruyère Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Business Address: 100-2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 562 6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Dec 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Genevieve Casey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Casey (CPSO#: 101662 )
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
613 774 2420
Business Address: 43 Bruyère Street
43 Bruyère Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C7
Business Address: 100-2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013