THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:18:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 201
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Phone: (289) 745-0051
Fax: 888-898-5095
Address: Division of Cardiology
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 46415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul SG Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hong (CPSO#: 101678 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Address: 460 Brant Street
Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 201
460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Phone: (289) 745-0051
Fax: 888-898-5095
Address: Division of Cardiology
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 46415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul SG Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hong (CPSO#: 101678 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Address: 460 Brant Street
Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL SOO GEE HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL SOO GEE HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013