THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 16:07:36 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
8 North Room 812C
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756 6990
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A. Massey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Massey (CPSO#: 101706 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
8 North Room 812C
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
8 North Room 812C
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756 6990
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A. Massey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Massey (CPSO#: 101706 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
8 North Room 812C
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN ANGELINA MASSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN ANGELINA MASSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013