THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 08:53:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Regional Cancer Program
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58640
Fax: (519) 685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. HELOU & RAPHAEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Helou (CPSO#: 101687 ) Dr. J. Raphael (CPSO#: 101711 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E

Corporation Name: Drs. Helou & Raphael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London Regional Cancer Program
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58640
Fax: (519) 685-8624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. HELOU & RAPHAEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Helou (CPSO#: 101687 ) Dr. J. Raphael (CPSO#: 101711 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E

Corporation Name: Drs. Helou & Raphael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JACQUES ANTOUN RAPHAEL may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JACQUES ANTOUN RAPHAEL may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013