THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:33:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.521.2100
Extension: 40694
Fax: 905-538-8953
Address: 1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: 1 833-460-0799
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 24 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ZIOLKOWSKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ziolkowski (CPSO#: 101723 )
Business Address: 1421 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5G 3H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.521.2100
Extension: 40694
Fax: 905-538-8953
Address: 1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: 1 833-460-0799
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 24 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ZIOLKOWSKI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ziolkowski (CPSO#: 101723 )
Business Address: 1421 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5G 3H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIA IRENA ZIOLKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIOLKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIA IRENA ZIOLKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIOLKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013