THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:45:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M0L8
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 815-5118
Fax: (905) 815-5136

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brajovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brajovic (CPSO#: 101733 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 815-5118

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M0L8
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 815-5118
Fax: (905) 815-5136

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brajovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brajovic (CPSO#: 101733 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 815-5118

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Oct 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 16 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Andrej Brajovic may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Andrej Brajovic may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2013