THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:43:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medisys Occupation Health Clinic
3300 Bloor St. West
Toronto Ontario M8X 2X2
Phone: 416-926-2698
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HARINEE SURENDRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Surendra (CPSO#: 101735 )
Business Address: 802-3280 Bloor St W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2X3
416-926-2698

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Medisys Occupation Health Clinic
3300 Bloor St. West
Toronto Ontario M8X 2X2
Phone: 416-926-2698
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HARINEE SURENDRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Surendra (CPSO#: 101735 )
Business Address: 802-3280 Bloor St W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2X3
416-926-2698

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARINEE SURENDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURENDRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARINEE SURENDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURENDRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2013