THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:47:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279
Address: Oncology Clinic
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Campus
105-2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 4666
Fax: (416) 281-7228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lau (CPSO#: 101766 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8113
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8231 Extn: 4666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279
Address: Oncology Clinic
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Campus
105-2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Extension: 4666
Fax: (416) 281-7228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lau (CPSO#: 101766 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8113
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8231 Extn: 4666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2013