THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:49:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yogesh Lala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lala (CPSO#: 101790 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yogesh Lala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lala (CPSO#: 101790 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOGESH LALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOGESH LALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2013