THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:37:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 4A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-873-4742
Fax: 905-873-7770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Shammaa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Shammaa (CPSO#: 101817 )
Business Address: 300 4th Avenue
Unit D
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
(289) 723-6615
Business Address: 95 Lincoln St
Pain Care Clinic
unit 1
Welland ON L3C 7C3
365-364-7246
Business Address: 6360 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls ON L2G 1T6
289-302 -7246
Business Address: 120 Guelph St
Normandy medical center
Halton Hills ON L7G 4A4
905-873-4742

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 4A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-873-4742
Fax: 905-873-7770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Shammaa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Shammaa (CPSO#: 101817 )
Business Address: 300 4th Avenue
Unit D
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
(289) 723-6615
Business Address: 95 Lincoln St
Pain Care Clinic
unit 1
Welland ON L3C 7C3
365-364-7246
Business Address: 6360 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls ON L2G 1T6
289-302 -7246
Business Address: 120 Guelph St
Normandy medical center
Halton Hills ON L7G 4A4
905-873-4742

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEER KADHIM AL-SHAMMAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMMAA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMEER KADHIM AL-SHAMMAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMMAA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 May 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 May 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013