THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:37:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite De Caen, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2818
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 May 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Lheureux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lheureux (CPSO#: 101840 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universite De Caen, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2818
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 May 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Lheureux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lheureux (CPSO#: 101840 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. STEPHANIE ODILE MARIE-THERESE MONIQUE LHEUREUX may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. LHEUREUX holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. LHEUREUX no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. STEPHANIE ODILE MARIE-THERESE MONIQUE LHEUREUX may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. LHEUREUX holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. LHEUREUX no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite De Caen, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2013