THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:30:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: PONGSACHAREONNONT, PEAR (Used Until: 14 Feb 2024)
Medical School: Chulalongkorn University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock St
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 08 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. PEAR FERREIRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ferreira (CPSO#: 101924 )
Business Address: 282 Johnson Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1Y4
4374227237

General Information

Former Name: PONGSACHAREONNONT, PEAR (Used Until: 14 Feb 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Chulalongkorn University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock St
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 08 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. PEAR FERREIRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ferreira (CPSO#: 101924 )
Business Address: 282 Johnson Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1Y4
4374227237

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Jul 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PEAR PONGSACHAREONNONT FERREIRA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, Queen's University, in which Dr. FERREIRA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. FERREIRA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. FERREIRA's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PEAR PONGSACHAREONNONT FERREIRA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, Queen's University, in which Dr. FERREIRA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. FERREIRA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. FERREIRA's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chulalongkorn University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2013