THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:55:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
PO Box 2030
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-351-6144
Extension: 5744
Fax: 519-351-0450
Address: 101-2475 McDougall Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9
Phone: 226-773-1413
Fax: 226-773-0951

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rizwan Rafiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rafiq (CPSO#: 101926 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
PO Box 2030
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 351-6144
Business Address: 43 Peachtree Lane
Chatham ON N7L 0B3
519-387--1279

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
PO Box 2030
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-351-6144
Extension: 5744
Fax: 519-351-0450
Address: 101-2475 McDougall Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9
Phone: 226-773-1413
Fax: 226-773-0951

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rizwan Rafiq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rafiq (CPSO#: 101926 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
PO Box 2030
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 351-6144
Business Address: 43 Peachtree Lane
Chatham ON N7L 0B3
519-387--1279

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIZWAN RAFIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIZWAN RAFIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFIQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2013