THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:51:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2772 Danforth Avenue Suite # 204
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 691-2600
Fax: (416) 691-6211
Address: 2nd-607 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Phone: 4166912600
Fax: 4166916211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Ramprasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ramprasad (CPSO#: 101954 )
Business Address: 2nd-607 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2772 Danforth Avenue Suite # 204
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 691-2600
Fax: (416) 691-6211
Address: 2nd-607 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Phone: 4166912600
Fax: 4166916211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Ramprasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ramprasad (CPSO#: 101954 )
Business Address: 2nd-607 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Feb 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Michael Robert Ramprasad may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Michael Robert Ramprasad may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013