THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:33:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3530 Derry Road East
Suite 204
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 612-8181
Fax: (905) 612-8187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dham (CPSO#: 101962 )
Business Address: 3530 Derry Road East
Suite 204
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 612-8181

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3530 Derry Road East
Suite 204
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 612-8181
Fax: (905) 612-8187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 12 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dham (CPSO#: 101962 )
Business Address: 3530 Derry Road East
Suite 204
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 612-8181

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Mar 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Bhavpreet Singh Dham may practise medicine independently in neurology.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Bhavpreet Singh Dham may practise medicine independently in neurology.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013