THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 07:01:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HJ Conter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Conter (CPSO#: 101966 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovarid Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HJ Conter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Conter (CPSO#: 101966 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovarid Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY JACOB CONTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY JACOB CONTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013