THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Rolling Hills Drive
Unit 5
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 942-0404
Fax: (519) 942-0400
Address: 263 Queen Street E
Unit 20
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K6
Phone: 1-905-497-2273
Fax: 905-497-4677
Address: 1104 Fennell Avenue East
Suite 1 &2
Hamilton Ontario L8T 1R9
Phone: 2896744800
Fax: 2896744802

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oyefeso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Oyefeso (CPSO#: 101988 )
Business Address: Unit 20
263 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K6
(905) 497-2273
Business Address: Suite 5
50 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6
(519) 942-0404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Benin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Rolling Hills Drive
Unit 5
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 942-0404
Fax: (519) 942-0400
Address: 263 Queen Street E
Unit 20
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K6
Phone: 1-905-497-2273
Fax: 905-497-4677
Address: 1104 Fennell Avenue East
Suite 1 &2
Hamilton Ontario L8T 1R9
Phone: 2896744800
Fax: 2896744802

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oyefeso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Oyefeso (CPSO#: 101988 )
Business Address: Unit 20
263 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K6
(905) 497-2273
Business Address: Suite 5
50 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 6T6
(519) 942-0404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUMIDE OYEFESO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEFESO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUMIDE OYEFESO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEFESO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013