THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
2nd Floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 728 7915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smita Sauve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sauve (CPSO#: 101997 )
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
247 Simcoe Street North
First Floor, Suite 101
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
(905) 728-7915

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1428 Highway 2
2nd Floor
Courtice ON L1E 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 728 7915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smita Sauve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sauve (CPSO#: 101997 )
Business Address: Medical Trust Clinics
247 Simcoe Street North
First Floor, Suite 101
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
(905) 728-7915

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Jun 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 09 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Smita Martand Sauve may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Smita Martand Sauve may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013