THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Ave W
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: 4163674301
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2Y9
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Phone: 519 970 9305
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UMC 1100 University Ave W
Windsor
Phone: 519 997 2404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Punungwe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Punungwe (CPSO#: 102001 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
(905) 456-8198
Business Address: P O Box 1376
150 King Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3H3
(705) 931-0231

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Ave W
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: 4163674301
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2Y9
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Phone: 519 970 9305
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UMC 1100 University Ave W
Windsor
Phone: 519 997 2404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Punungwe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Punungwe (CPSO#: 102001 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4W5
(905) 456-8198
Business Address: P O Box 1376
150 King Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 3H3
(705) 931-0231

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Aug 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rudo Pamela Tinoda Punungwe may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rudo Pamela Tinoda Punungwe may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2013