THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:34:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Summersides Boulevard
Welland Ontario L3B 5N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475225259
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bokhari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bokhari (CPSO#: 102002 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Internal Medicine
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(647) 522-5259

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 Summersides Boulevard
Welland Ontario L3B 5N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475225259
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bokhari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bokhari (CPSO#: 102002 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Internal Medicine
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(647) 522-5259

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Sep 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 15 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syed Amin Bokhari may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syed Amin Bokhari may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013