THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1977
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Torbram Medical Centre and
Walk In Clinic
Unit 9-10
105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 789-1750
Fax: (905) 789-1787
Address: Winston Churchill Medical Centre
6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle;
Suite 1 A
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2W7
Phone: 905 812 5404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nargis Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqi (CPSO#: 102030 )
Business Address: 105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W9
(905) 789-1750

Corporation Name: Dr. Nargis Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Torbram Medical Centre and
Walk In Clinic
Unit 9-10
105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 789-1750
Fax: (905) 789-1787
Address: Winston Churchill Medical Centre
6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle;
Suite 1 A
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2W7
Phone: 905 812 5404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nargis Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqi (CPSO#: 102030 )
Business Address: 105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W9
(905) 789-1750

Corporation Name: Dr. Nargis Siddiqi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARGIS REHMAN SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARGIS REHMAN SIDDIQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2013