THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: 6473600351

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avni Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mehta (CPSO#: 102041 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: 6473600351

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avni Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mehta (CPSO#: 102041 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVNI BHARAT MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVNI BHARAT MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013