THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:27:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Care Medical Centre
Suite 12
1151 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 276 2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 169 Main Street
Grimsby Ontario L3M5J5
Phone: 9059452253
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 100
701 main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
Phone: (289) 768-7246
Fax: (289) 779-2273
Address: 6360 Lundy's Ln.
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1T6
Phone: 2893027246
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samy Faltas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faltas (CPSO#: 102044 )
Business Address: Family Care Medical Centre
1151 Dundas Street West
Suite 12
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1C6
(905) 276-2700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Care Medical Centre
Suite 12
1151 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 276 2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 169 Main Street
Grimsby Ontario L3M5J5
Phone: 9059452253
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 100
701 main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
Phone: (289) 768-7246
Fax: (289) 779-2273
Address: 6360 Lundy's Ln.
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1T6
Phone: 2893027246
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samy Faltas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Faltas (CPSO#: 102044 )
Business Address: Family Care Medical Centre
1151 Dundas Street West
Suite 12
Mississauga Ontario L5C 1C6
(905) 276-2700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMY REFAAT NAZMY FALTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALTAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMY REFAAT NAZMY FALTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALTAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013