THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:05:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2180 Meadowvale Blvd
The Reproductive Care Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058169822
Fax: 9058169833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHEENA CHANGELA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Changela (CPSO#: 102064 )
Business Address: 4700 Keele St
North York ON M3J 1P3
Business Address: 8 York St
Toronto ON M5J 2Y2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2180 Meadowvale Blvd
The Reproductive Care Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058169822
Fax: 9058169833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHEENA CHANGELA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Changela (CPSO#: 102064 )
Business Address: 4700 Keele St
North York ON M3J 1P3
Business Address: 8 York St
Toronto ON M5J 2Y2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEENA JAYANTILAL CHANGELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANGELA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEENA JAYANTILAL CHANGELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANGELA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013