THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:31:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tours, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Forensic Psychiatry Program
St Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastien Prat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prat (CPSO#: 102065 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Tours, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Forensic Psychiatry Program
St Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastien Prat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prat (CPSO#: 102065 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEBASTIEN STEPHANE GINO PRAT may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and forensic psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEBASTIEN STEPHANE GINO PRAT may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and forensic psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tours, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2013