THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:56:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Fairview St. Suite #11
Burlington Ontario L7S 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 637-5885
Fax: (905) 637-0372

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Alsaigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Alsaigh (CPSO#: 102071 )
Business Address: Suite 11
1235 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 2H9
(905) 637-5885

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Fairview St. Suite #11
Burlington Ontario L7S 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 637-5885
Fax: (905) 637-0372

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Alsaigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Alsaigh (CPSO#: 102071 )
Business Address: Suite 11
1235 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 2H9
(905) 637-5885

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA ALSAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAIGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA ALSAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSAIGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2013