THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519)941-7060
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Family Practice Department
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: 5199412410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodriguez Molares Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodriguez Molares (CPSO#: 102089 )
Business Address: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519)941-7060
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Family Practice Department
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: 5199412410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodriguez Molares Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodriguez Molares (CPSO#: 102089 )
Business Address: Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-7575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERCEDES CRISTINA RODRIGUEZ MOLARES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ MOLARES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERCEDES CRISTINA RODRIGUEZ MOLARES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ MOLARES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013