THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1972 Parkedale Avenue West
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-865-9089
Fax: 613-345-3896

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHARON KOUBI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koubi (CPSO#: 102091 )
Business Address: 1419 Maplewood Drive
Brockville Ontario K6V 7C2
3066202404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1972 Parkedale Avenue West
Brockville Ontario K6V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-865-9089
Fax: 613-345-3896

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHARON KOUBI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koubi (CPSO#: 102091 )
Business Address: 1419 Maplewood Drive
Brockville Ontario K6V 7C2
3066202404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON KOUBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUBI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON KOUBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUBI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2013