THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:11:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Quaid-i-Azam University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Penetanguishene Road
Unit 103A
Midland Ontario L4R 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 249 388 3747
Fax: 249 388 3748

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SAQIB UTMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Utman (CPSO#: 102119 )
Business Address: 1755 Bridewell Court
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3V9
Business Address: 240 Penetanguishene Road
Unit 103A
Midland Ontario L4R 1Y1
2493883747
Business Address: 240 Penetanguishene Road
Unit 103-A
Midland Ontario L4R 1Y1

Corporation Name: HANNA BAIG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Utman (CPSO#: 102119 ) Dr. H. Baig (CPSO#: 128745 )
Business Address: 80-3465 Platinum Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
(289) 813-0786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Quaid-i-Azam University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Penetanguishene Road
Unit 103A
Midland Ontario L4R 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 249 388 3747
Fax: 249 388 3748

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SAQIB UTMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Utman (CPSO#: 102119 )
Business Address: 1755 Bridewell Court
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3V9
Business Address: 240 Penetanguishene Road
Unit 103A
Midland Ontario L4R 1Y1
2493883747
Business Address: 240 Penetanguishene Road
Unit 103-A
Midland Ontario L4R 1Y1

Corporation Name: HANNA BAIG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Utman (CPSO#: 102119 ) Dr. H. Baig (CPSO#: 128745 )
Business Address: 80-3465 Platinum Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S1
(289) 813-0786

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAQIB ALI KHAN UTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAQIB ALI KHAN UTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Quaid-i-Azam University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2013