THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
suite 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampark Walk-In Clinic
suite 16
2120 N Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-0100
Fax: (905) 792-0190
Address: 301-358 Dufferin St
Toronto ON M6K 1Z8
Phone: 4372669242
Fax: 4373179611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Chami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chami (CPSO#: 102128 )
Business Address: Bramalea and Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
(905) 793-3311
Business Address: Brampton Walk-In Clinic
Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-0100
Business Address: 53 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5E 1J3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bramalea & Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
suite 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampark Walk-In Clinic
suite 16
2120 N Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-0100
Fax: (905) 792-0190
Address: 301-358 Dufferin St
Toronto ON M6K 1Z8
Phone: 4372669242
Fax: 4373179611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Chami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chami (CPSO#: 102128 )
Business Address: Bramalea and Bovaird Walk-In Clinic
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6R 0K1
(905) 793-3311
Business Address: Brampton Walk-In Clinic
Unit 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 792-0100
Business Address: 53 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5E 1J3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE CHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE CHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2013