THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:47:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
FG41 - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4098
Fax: (416) 480-6818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Damien Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gallagher (CPSO#: 102135 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
F Wing Ground Floor-FG41
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4098

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
FG41 - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4098
Fax: (416) 480-6818

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Damien Gallagher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gallagher (CPSO#: 102135 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
F Wing Ground Floor-FG41
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4098

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAMIEN OLIVER GALLAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAGHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAMIEN OLIVER GALLAGHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAGHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013