THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3545 Kingston Rd
Markham Kingston Medical Centre
Scarborough ON M1M 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 266 6600
Fax: 416 266 6604
Address: 10 Teesdale Pl
Teesdale Medical Centre
Scarborough ON M1L 1K9
Phone: 416 694 4666
Fax: 416 694 9975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thanesan Gurumurthi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gurumurthi (CPSO#: 102136 )
Business Address: Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1M 1R6
(416) 266-6600
Business Address: Teesdale Medical Centre
10 Teesdale Place
Scarborough Ontario M1L 1L1
(416) 694-4666
Business Address: Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1H8
(416) 264-4848
Business Address: 3775 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 3H4
4162388135

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3545 Kingston Rd
Markham Kingston Medical Centre
Scarborough ON M1M 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 266 6600
Fax: 416 266 6604
Address: 10 Teesdale Pl
Teesdale Medical Centre
Scarborough ON M1L 1K9
Phone: 416 694 4666
Fax: 416 694 9975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thanesan Gurumurthi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gurumurthi (CPSO#: 102136 )
Business Address: Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1M 1R6
(416) 266-6600
Business Address: Teesdale Medical Centre
10 Teesdale Place
Scarborough Ontario M1L 1L1
(416) 694-4666
Business Address: Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1H8
(416) 264-4848
Business Address: 3775 Kingston Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 3H4
4162388135

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Feb 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 26 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Thanesan Gurumurthi may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Thanesan Gurumurthi may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013