THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1453 Prince Road
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Hospital
Family Medicine Hospitalist
Restorative care
Windsor Ontario N9C 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-257-5111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie Shores Healthcare Hospital
Family Medicine Hospitalist
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Phone: 519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Rosleand After Hours Medical Clinic
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Phone: 519-972-3944
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Reginal Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: WIndsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Starczewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Starczewski (CPSO#: 102144 )
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Hospital
Windsor Ontario N9C 3A9
519-257-5111
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1453 Prince Road
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Hospital
Family Medicine Hospitalist
Restorative care
Windsor Ontario N9C 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-257-5111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie Shores Healthcare Hospital
Family Medicine Hospitalist
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Phone: 519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Rosleand After Hours Medical Clinic
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Phone: 519-972-3944
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Reginal Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: WIndsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna Starczewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Starczewski (CPSO#: 102144 )
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Hospital
Windsor Ontario N9C 3A9
519-257-5111
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA STARCZEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARCZEWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA STARCZEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARCZEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013