THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 104
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Lawrence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lawrence (CPSO#: 102147 )
Business Address: Bristol Circle Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 104
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(905) 829-2826

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 104
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Lawrence Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lawrence (CPSO#: 102147 )
Business Address: Bristol Circle Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 104
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(905) 829-2826

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Feb 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 26 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Joseph Lawrence may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. David Joseph Lawrence may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013