THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:47:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: College of Medical Sciences, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 8954521
Fax: 905 830 5977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gaurav Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mehta (CPSO#: 102148 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
West Building, 5th Floor
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 5330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: College of Medical Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 8954521
Fax: 905 830 5977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gaurav Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mehta (CPSO#: 102148 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
West Building, 5th Floor
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 5330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAURAV MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAURAV MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: College of Medical Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2013