THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI, FARSI, HINDI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit # 2 - 4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester Ontario N0L 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 202-7391
Fax: (519) 202-7393
Address: 641 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6C 2T9
Phone: (519) 686-8585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sardar Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmad (CPSO#: 102159 )
Business Address: 2-4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester Ontario N0L 1G3
(519) 202-7391

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI, FARSI, HINDI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit # 2 - 4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester Ontario N0L 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 202-7391
Fax: (519) 202-7393
Address: 641 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6C 2T9
Phone: (519) 686-8585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sardar Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmad (CPSO#: 102159 )
Business Address: 2-4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester Ontario N0L 1G3
(519) 202-7391

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARDAR AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARDAR AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013