THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:28:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
760 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5E 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 271-7410
Fax: (905) 271-7647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell-Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mitchell-Lambert (CPSO#: 102164 )
Business Address: Suite 105
760 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5E 1C7
(905) 271-7410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
760 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5E 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 271-7410
Fax: (905) 271-7647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell-Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mitchell-Lambert (CPSO#: 102164 )
Business Address: Suite 105
760 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5E 1C7
(905) 271-7410

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 08 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tenisha Natalie Mitchell-Lambert may practise medicine independently in
family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tenisha Natalie Mitchell-Lambert may practise medicine independently in
family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013