THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9292 County Road 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 527-6560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 18120 Yonge St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y4V8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y5
Phone: 705-325-6265
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodney Land Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Land (CPSO#: 102180 )
Business Address: 9292 County Road 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
(705) 527-0388
Business Address: 18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4V8
(905) 895-0008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9292 County Road 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 527-6560
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 18120 Yonge St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y4V8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 43 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y5
Phone: 705-325-6265
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodney Land Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Land (CPSO#: 102180 )
Business Address: 9292 County Road 93
Midland Ontario L4R 4K4
(705) 527-0388
Business Address: 18120 Yonge Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4V8
(905) 895-0008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RODNEY CHRISTOPHER LAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RODNEY CHRISTOPHER LAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2013