THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham-Stouffville Urgent
Care Centre
Unit 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: 9054726081
Address: 700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H2A7
Phone: 4162643443
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7670 Yonge St.
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W1
Phone: (905) 597-7747
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8108 YONGE STREET
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W4
Phone: 9057099955
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 218 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 2E6
Phone: 6473474444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taghaddos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taghaddos (CPSO#: 102199 )
Business Address: 8108 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W4
(905) 709-9955
Business Address: Markham-Stouffville Urgent Care Centre
100 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911
Business Address: 7670 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W1
(905) 597-7747
Business Address: 700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 264-3443

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham-Stouffville Urgent
Care Centre
Unit 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: 9054726081
Address: 700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H2A7
Phone: 4162643443
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7670 Yonge St.
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W1
Phone: (905) 597-7747
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8108 YONGE STREET
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W4
Phone: 9057099955
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 218 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 2E6
Phone: 6473474444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taghaddos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taghaddos (CPSO#: 102199 )
Business Address: 8108 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W4
(905) 709-9955
Business Address: Markham-Stouffville Urgent Care Centre
100 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911
Business Address: 7670 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W1
(905) 597-7747
Business Address: 700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 264-3443

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED NADER TAGHADDOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGHADDOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED NADER TAGHADDOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGHADDOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2013