THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:05:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospice of Windsor and Essex County
6038 Empress St.
Windsor Ontario N8T1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199747100
Fax: 5199747672
Address: Chatham-Kent Hospice
34 Wellington St. E
Chatham Ontario N7M3N7
Phone: 5193543113
Fax: 5194369982
Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M5L9
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie Shores Hospice
197 Talbot St. W
Unit 701
Leamington Ontario N8H1N8
Phone: 5199464920
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W1L9
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Burgess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Burgess (CPSO#: 102200 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Hospice
34 Wellington Street East
Chatham Ontario N7M 3N7
(519) 354-3113
Business Address: 6038 Empress Street
Windsor Ontario N8T 1B5
(519) 974-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospice of Windsor and Essex County
6038 Empress St.
Windsor Ontario N8T1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199747100
Fax: 5199747672
Address: Chatham-Kent Hospice
34 Wellington St. E
Chatham Ontario N7M3N7
Phone: 5193543113
Fax: 5194369982
Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7M5L9
Phone: 5193526400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie Shores Hospice
197 Talbot St. W
Unit 701
Leamington Ontario N8H1N8
Phone: 5199464920
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W1L9
Phone: 5192545577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Burgess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Burgess (CPSO#: 102200 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Hospice
34 Wellington Street East
Chatham Ontario N7M 3N7
(519) 354-3113
Business Address: 6038 Empress Street
Windsor Ontario N8T 1B5
(519) 974-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS SCOTT TARO BURGESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGESS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS SCOTT TARO BURGESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGESS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013