THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
L102Q
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 64830
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moxley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moxley (CPSO#: 102215 )
Business Address: Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Address: 440 Boler Road
Suite 200
London Ontario N6K 4L2
Business Address: Suite 108
450 Central
London Ontario N6B 2E8
Business Address: Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London Ontario N5Z 2C1
(519) 433-8424
Business Address: 800 Commissioner's Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Hospital
KGE31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416-480-6100 Extn: 64830
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room KGE31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416-480-6100 Extn: 4830
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
KGE31
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-6100 Extn: 4830

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
L102Q
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Extension: 64830
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moxley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Moxley (CPSO#: 102215 )
Business Address: Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road South
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Address: 440 Boler Road
Suite 200
London Ontario N6K 4L2
Business Address: Suite 108
450 Central
London Ontario N6B 2E8
Business Address: Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London Ontario N5Z 2C1
(519) 433-8424
Business Address: 800 Commissioner's Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Hospital
KGE31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416-480-6100 Extn: 64830
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room KGE31
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416-480-6100 Extn: 4830
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
KGE31
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-6100 Extn: 4830

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBYN ELIZABETH MOXLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOXLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBYN ELIZABETH MOXLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOXLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013