THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:48:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITE D'ALGER, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-4473 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 1A7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 613-424-5800
Fax: 613-424-5900
Address: 1585 Tenth Line Rd
RAY-FRIEL center
COVID-19 CARE CLINIC
Orléans ON K1E 3E8
Phone: 613-288-5353
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1750 Russel road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5Z6
Phone: 613-526-7170
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nacera Bensmaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bensmaine (CPSO#: 102246 )
Business Address: 509 Des Genévriers Rue
Orléans ON K4A 0Z2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: UNIVERSITE D'ALGER, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-4473 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K4A 1A7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 613-424-5800
Fax: 613-424-5900
Address: 1585 Tenth Line Rd
RAY-FRIEL center
COVID-19 CARE CLINIC
Orléans ON K1E 3E8
Phone: 613-288-5353
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1750 Russel road
Ottawa Ontario K1G 5Z6
Phone: 613-526-7170
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nacera Bensmaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bensmaine (CPSO#: 102246 )
Business Address: 509 Des Genévriers Rue
Orléans ON K4A 0Z2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NACERA KHEIRA BENSMAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSMAINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NACERA KHEIRA BENSMAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSMAINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITE D'ALGER, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2013