THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:17:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8375 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-357-1661
Extension: 3
Fax: 905-371-9090
Address: 635 Prince Charles Dr N
Royal Rose LTC
Erie/Ontario Units
3rd floor
Welland ON L3C 0C7
Phone: 2894800400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mondeesh Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sidhu (CPSO#: 102253 )
Business Address: 12 Bartlett Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L3M 4N5
(888) 282-7763
Business Address: 20 Ernest Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 7T2
(905) 937-9703
Business Address: 8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
(905) 357-1661

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8375 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-357-1661
Extension: 3
Fax: 905-371-9090
Address: 635 Prince Charles Dr N
Royal Rose LTC
Erie/Ontario Units
3rd floor
Welland ON L3C 0C7
Phone: 2894800400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mondeesh Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sidhu (CPSO#: 102253 )
Business Address: 12 Bartlett Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L3M 4N5
(888) 282-7763
Business Address: 20 Ernest Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 7T2
(905) 937-9703
Business Address: 8279 Lundy's Lane
Unit A3/A4
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 1H5
(905) 357-1661

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONDEESH KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONDEESH KAUR SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013