THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10886 Hurontario St
Suite 9&10
Brampton ON L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Uddaraju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Uddaraju (CPSO#: 102272 )
Business Address: Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C5
(905) 799-2273
Business Address: 9-10886 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L7A 3R9
905-846-9911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TELUGU
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10886 Hurontario St
Suite 9&10
Brampton ON L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Uddaraju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Uddaraju (CPSO#: 102272 )
Business Address: Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C5
(905) 799-2273
Business Address: 9-10886 Hurontario St
Brampton ON L7A 3R9
905-846-9911

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jun 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 18 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Maithry Uddaraju may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Maithry Uddaraju may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013