THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 23:47:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1501 Ellesmere Road
Unit 100
Toronto Ontario M1P 4T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164390163
Fax: 4164397609
Address: 55 Dundas Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
Phone: 416-361-6000
Fax: 416-361-6044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shabbir Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain (CPSO#: 102276 )
Business Address: Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Basement Level
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
(416) 361-6000
Business Address: 2900 Warden Avenue
Suite 160
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S8

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1501 Ellesmere Road
Unit 100
Toronto Ontario M1P 4T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164390163
Fax: 4164397609
Address: 55 Dundas Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
Phone: 416-361-6000
Fax: 416-361-6044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shabbir Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain (CPSO#: 102276 )
Business Address: Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Basement Level
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
(416) 361-6000
Business Address: 2900 Warden Avenue
Suite 160
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S8

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABBIR HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABBIR HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2022
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2013