THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:32:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-2281
Fax: (705) 645-0057

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen M. Rix Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rix (CPSO#: 102277 )
Business Address: Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C2
(705) 645-2281

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-2281
Fax: (705) 645-0057

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen M. Rix Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rix (CPSO#: 102277 )
Business Address: Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C2
(705) 645-2281

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN MARK RIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN MARK RIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2013