THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 19:18:45 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: 905 523 1224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Vuong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vuong (CPSO#: 102287 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-1200 Extn: 44890

Corporation Name: Sebastian Vuong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: 905 523 1224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Vuong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vuong (CPSO#: 102287 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-1200 Extn: 44890

Corporation Name: Sebastian Vuong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN VUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN VUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2013