THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:10:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1887 Jane Street
North York Ontario M9N 3S7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 340 6397
Fax: 647 350 6397

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria
USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce-Lyn Oguamanam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oguamanam (CPSO#: 102299 )
Business Address: 1887 Jane Street
Suite 101
North York Ontario M9N 3S7
(647) 340-6397

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1887 Jane Street
North York Ontario M9N 3S7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 340 6397
Fax: 647 350 6397

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria
USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce-Lyn Oguamanam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oguamanam (CPSO#: 102299 )
Business Address: 1887 Jane Street
Suite 101
North York Ontario M9N 3S7
(647) 340-6397

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Apr 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 09 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Joyce-Lyn Nkeiru Oguamanam may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Joyce-Lyn Nkeiru Oguamanam may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2013