THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:58:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
University of Toronto
#1148
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farooq Naeem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Naeem (CPSO#: 102306 )
Business Address: University of Toronto
250 College Street
Suite 1148
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
University of Toronto
#1148
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Jan 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farooq Naeem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Naeem (CPSO#: 102306 )
Business Address: University of Toronto
250 College Street
Suite 1148
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FAROOQ NAEEM may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FAROOQ NAEEM may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical College, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2013